THE BRITISH INTERPLANETARY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Interplanetary Society promotes the exploration and use of space for the benefit of humanity, by connecting people to create, educate and inspire, and advance knowledge in all aspects of astronautics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
Total income includes £8,888 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 1967: Standard registration
- 01 June 1993: Removed
- B I S (Working name)
- THE BRITISH INTERPLANETARY SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MALCOLM PHILP | Chair | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Patrick Shoulder | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Anthony Rennie | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Hughes Brand | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Thomas Scott Meek | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen George Christopher Salmon | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fabrizio Bernardini | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR DRUMMOND SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gerald Maurice WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £543.33k | £439.26k | £401.60k | £354.41k | £423.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £506.26k | £461.30k | £497.55k | £362.72k | £445.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.76k | N/A | £8.89k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £317.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £168.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £103 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £53.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £503.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £2.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2023 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2023 | 475 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 18 October 2023 | 475 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 21ST OCTOBER 1965, 28TH SEPTEMBER 1985, 17TH SEPTEMBER 1988 AND 25TH AUGUST 1994 as amended on 04 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE AND THE SPREAD OF EDUCATION AND PARTICULARLY TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO THE SCIENCE, ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY OF ASTRONAUTICS AND TO SUPPORT AND ENGAGE IN RESEARCH STUDIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 13 January 1967 : Standard registration
- 01 June 1993 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRITISH INTERPLANETARY SOCIETY
27-29 SOUTH LAMBETH ROAD
LONDON
SW8 1SZ
- Phone:
- 02077353160
- Email:
- info@bis-space.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window