Trustees THE BRITISH INTERPLANETARY SOCIETY
Charity number: 250556

Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN MALCOLM PHILP | Chair | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Patrick Shoulder | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Anthony Rennie | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Hughes Brand | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Iain Thomas Scott Meek | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen George Christopher Salmon | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fabrizio Bernardini | Trustee | 22 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DAVID OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALISTAIR DRUMMOND SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Gerald Maurice WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.