HATTON CONSOLIDATED FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help those who live in the villages of Beausale, Hatton and Shrewley exclusively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 29 December 1966: Standard registration
- HATTON CHARITIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Whitehead | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zara Hadfield | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Lowe | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL HEATHER BLOWER | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Gaye Williams | Trustee | 21 October 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.01k | £11.68k | £11.12k | £10.62k | £12.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £11.97k | £12.34k | £9.17k | £8.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15/06/1909 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/12/1953 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/03/2011
Charitable objects
39. INCOME APPLICABLE UNDER THIS SCHEME FOR ELEEMOSYNARY PURPOSES IN A SPECIFIED ANCIENT PARISH SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES CONCERNED IN MAKING PAYMENTS, UNDER ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING HEADS, FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE POOR OF THAT ANCIENT PARISH GENERALLY, OR OF SUCH DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS SUCH TRUSTEES SELECT FOR THIS PURPOSE, AND IN SUCH WAY AS THEY CONSIDER MOST ADVANTAGEOUS TO THE RECIPIENTS:- I. SUBSCRIPTIONS OR DONATIONS IN AID OF THE FUNDS OF - (A) ANY CONVALESCENT HOME UPON SUCH TERMS (SO FAR AS MAY BE) AS TO ENABLE THE TRUSTEES TO SECURE THE BENEFITS OF THE CONVALESCENT HOME FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITIES; (B) ANY PROVIDENT CLUB OR SOCIETY ESTABLISHED IN OR NEAR THE ANCIENT PARISH FOR THE SUPPLY OF FUEL, CLOTHING OR OTHER NECESSARIES; II. GRANTS OR CONTRIBUTIONS FOR OR TOWARDS - (A) THE TRAVELLING EXPENSES OF PATIENTS TO AND FROM ANY SUCH CONVALESCENT HOME AS IS MENTIONED IN HEAD I ABOVE; (B) THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS QUALIFIED AS AFORESAID WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION OR COURSE OF EDUCATION BY OUTFITS, PAYMENT OF FEES FOR INSTRUCTION, PAYMENT OF TRAVELLING EXPENSES OR SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OR TO ENABLE THEM TO EARN THEIR OWN LIVING AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (C) THE COST OF PROVIDING PROPER CARE AND SUPERVISION (INCLUDING ANY NECESSARY COST OF TRAVELLING) FOR PERSONS IN NEED REQUIRING TEMPORARY CHANGE OF AIR SPECIAL PROTECTION OR TREATMENT; OR FOR OTHER REASONS AS MAY BE APPROVED BY AN APPROPRIATE MEDICAL PRACTITIONER; III. THE SUPPLY OF - (A) CLOTHES, FOOTWEAR, BEDDING, FUEL, FOOD OR OTHER ARTICLES IN KIND; (B) TEMPORARY ASSISTANCE IN MONEY, BY WAY OF LOAN OR OTHERWISE, IN CASE OF SICKNESS, SPECIAL DISTRESS OR UNEXPECTED LOSS; PROVIDED THAT SUCH INCOME SHALL IN NO CASE BE APPLIED IN RELIEF OF COUNCIL TAX, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS OR SO THAT ANY INDIVIDUAL OR INSTITUTION MAY BECOME ENTITLED TO A PERIODICAL OR RECURRENT BENEFIT THEREFROM.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF HATTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Haseley Court
Birmingham Road
Haseley
WARWICK
CV35 7HG
- Phone:
- 07876642649
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window