CLEVELAND SCIENTIFIC INSTITUTION

Charity Number: 250599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Advancement of metallurgical, mining, chemical, engineering and shipbuilding sciences. Provision of rooms for study and facilities for lectures. Making grants for research, or study solely or jointly with other bodies. Provision of grants to schools for the encouragement of science & engineering subjects. Provision of grants for students to attend university.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £31,010
Total expenditure: £32,700

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington
  • Durham
  • Hartlepool
  • Middlesbrough
  • North Yorkshire
  • Redcar And Cleveland
  • Stockton-on-tees

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Pallant Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Joanne Rout Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
William Suthers Trustee 07 November 2016
None on record
Mark Lewis Trustee 10 October 2016
None on record
THOMAS BOWMAN BRADLEY Trustee 11 January 2016
None on record
Mrs Kellerman Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
Mr Heslop Trustee 09 March 2015
None on record
Dr McGinnis Trustee 22 January 2014
THORNABY FOODBANK
Received: On time
Dr Brabbs Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record
Mr Young Trustee 06 January 2014
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN NUNTHORPE
Received: On time
MR NORTHEY Trustee 15 February 2013
None on record
MR KIRK Trustee 16 December 2011
DIOCESE OF MIDDLESBROUGH CATHOLIC HANDICAPPED FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
MR HOWARD Trustee 16 December 2011
None on record
MRS PARKER Trustee
None on record
MR TICKNER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £30.01k £32.13k £30.63k £32.16k £31.01k
Total expenditure £31.92k £23.55k £28.17k £20.29k £32.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 17 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 25 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT PRINCIPLE PROBATE REGISTRY 25 AUGUST 1932 AND SCHEME OF 20 AUGUST 1992
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A SCHOLARSHIP OF SUCH SUM AS THE TRUSTEE MAY THINK PROPER TO A YOUNG PERSON BEING TRAINED IN THE METALLURGICAL, MINING, CHEMICAL, ENGINEERING OR SHIP BUILDING SCIENCES
Area of benefit
CLEVELAND
Registration history
  • 29 October 1992 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Orchard House
Newton under Roseberry
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS9 6QR
Phone:
01642724948
Website:

clevelandscientific.org.uk