BLACKPOOL MUSICAL FESTIVAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF AMATEUR PERFORMERS IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DANCE AND SPEECH BY PROMOTING ANNUAL FESTIVALS, CONCERTS, RECITALS OR CLASSES FOR PERFORMANCE IN COMPETITION OR OTHERWISE, TOGETHER WITH PROFESSIONAL CONSTRUCTIVE CRITICISM AND GUIDANCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Blackpool
Governance
- 26 June 1967: Standard registration
- 26 August 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BLACKPOOL FESTIVAL FOR MUSIC, DANCE & SPEECH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.89k | £12.15k | £14.25k | £14.32k | £12.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.83k | £10.29k | £9.89k | £7.51k | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 24 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 10 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 05 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 09 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATIONS AS AMENDED 8 MAY 1967 AND 6 JANUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 10TH FEBRUARY 1990.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY IMPROVING THE AESTHETIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC AND SPEECH BY THE PROMOTION OF FESTIVALS FOR THE PERFORMANCE IN COMPETITION OR OTHERWISE OF WORKS OF MUSIC AND SPEECH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window