WOKING AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of social, leisure and educational activities for people with learning disabilities and their parents or other carers. To work with people with learning disabilities to help them to have as independent a life as possible in accordance with their wishes. To increase public knowledge of the problems faced by people with learning disabilities and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 January 1967: Standard registration
- WOKING MENCAP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIET FEWINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Rapley | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Murray | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Mary Stevens | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RONA RAPLEY | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Horsfield | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Val Wye | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA GABRIEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.32k | £20.57k | £65.16k | £8.21k | £11.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.87k | £23.84k | £11.41k | £22.04k | £26.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AMENDED 12TH NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PREVENT LEARNING DISABILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND TO ADVANCE RELIGION AMONGST PERSONS WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY; AND B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
WOKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Barchester Close
Uxbridge Road
Hanwell
London
W7 3XA
- Phone:
- 02088405068
- Email:
- GRAHAM.WORSFOLD7@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window