BRIDGE ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity oversees five almshouses, collects weekly maintenance contributions from the five occupiers, and maintains the properties in a good state of repair, and looks after the welfare of the five lady occupants. The five houses are 139-147, Church Lane, Marple, Stockport SK6 7LD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 02 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV DANIEL ROBERT CURRIE | Chair | 02 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Deacon Jude Laycock | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Colin MacAlister | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Buckley | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marion Jefferson | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE HARRISON | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|||||
MR BILL RILEY | Trustee | 01 October 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.94k | £19.08k | £19.53k | £21.42k | £24.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.87k | £3.51k | £4.40k | £5.85k | £5.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16TH JAN 2002
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
THE MUNICIPAL WARDS OF NORTH ADN SOUTH MARPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 OAKDENE ROAD
MARPLE
STOCKPORT
SK6 6PJ
- Phone:
- 01614276306
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window