Accounts and annual returns THE OBLATE SISTERS OF ST FRANCIS DE SALES

Charity number: 250693
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2009 26 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 26 April 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 10 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 10 March 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 19 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 19 May 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2006 21 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 30 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2005 10 July 2006 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 05 June 2006 On Time