Financial history THE OBLATE SISTERS OF ST FRANCIS DE SALES

Charity number: 250693
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2005 31/08/2006 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009
Total gross income £45.03k £45.03k £18.79k £45.05k £26.27k
Total expenditure £40.72k £40.77k £12.02k £12.05k £49.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A