PARK ROYAL OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's current activities include the provision of occupational health services, flu vaccinations and travel vaccinations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 21 December 1966: Standard registration
- PRO HEALTH (Working name)
- WEST LONDON OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ion Metsovitis | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ruwan Strangeways | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Steven Yip | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.87k | £5.39k | £170 | £13.76k | £59.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.37k | £9.11k | £7.08k | £8.19k | £12.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH AUGUST 1958 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 16TH JUNE 1976 AND 19TH JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE POPULATION BY THE PREVENTION AND CURE OF OCCUPATIONAL DISEASES AND INJURIES AND TO PROMOTE THE GENERAL HEALTH OF THE WORKSERS.
Area of benefit
WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 DALSTON GARDENS
STANMORE
HA7 1BU
- Phone:
- 07711479080
- Email:
- davidyelee@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window