WILMINGTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief in need for applicants who live within the area of benefit East of the River Hull
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 17 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Gerald Padwick | Chair | 25 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
CANON RICHARD LIVERSEDGE | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev David Griffith-Jones | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Christopher van Straaten | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £462 | £408 | £378 | £586 | £692 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.30k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 21 JUNE 1973 AND AS ALTERED OR AFFECTED BY SCHEME DATED 14 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME AND AT THEIR DISCRETION, THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHRITY IN PROVIDING HOLIDAYS OAT THE SEASIDE OR ELSEWHERE FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THEIR HEALTH.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 CALEDONIA PARK
HULL
HU9 1TE
- Phone:
- 01482223050
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window