QUEEN ELIZABETH'S GRANT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY IS REQUIRED UNDER ITS DEED OF GRANT TO MAKE CERTAIN GRANTS ON AN ANNUAL BASIS. IN ADDITION IT MAY USE THE BALANCE 'IN PROMOTING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA COMPRISING THE BOROUGH OF STAFFORD (AS AT 31ST MARCH 1974) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 17 March 1967: Standard registration
- 20 June 1992: Removed
- Q E G (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT NORMAN PERKIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Savage | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Taylor | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
GINA MILSOM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE MAYOR OF STAFFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
RECTOR OF PARISH OF STAFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.09k | £18.85k | £19.64k | £20.36k | £20.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.61k | £20.12k | £14.56k | £20.17k | £17.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 FEBRUARY 1984 as amended on 12 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
YEARLY INCOME TO BE APPLIED AS FOLLOWS:- A) IN PAYING TO THE RECTOR FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STAFFORD THE YEARLY SUM OF £16 OR SUCH OTHER YEARLY SUM AS THE COMMISSIONERS FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVE; B) IN PAYING TO THE SUB-RECTOR OF THE SAID PARISH £8 OR SUCH OTHER YEARLY SUM; C) AS TO ONE HALF OF THE RESIDUE THEREOF, IN OR TOWARDS THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE PARISH CHAURCH OF ST MARY, STAFFORD; D) AS TO THE OTHER HALF OF THE RESIDUE THEREOF IN PROMOTING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA COMPRISING THE BOROUGH OF STAFFORD (AS AT 31 MARCH 2024) AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF STAFFORD AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 MARCH 1974
Linked charities
- 17 March 1967 : Standard registration
- 20 June 1992 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Clevedon Avenue
Stafford
ST17 0DJ
- Phone:
- 01785614987
- Email:
- raymond.summers@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window