THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION (BLACKHALL BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare or serving and ex-serving Air Forces people and their dependants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Durham
Governance
- 03 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Teasdale | Chair | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Veitch | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hagan | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Houghton | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walker | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.10k | £16.21k | £15.56k | £2.12k | £2.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £20.73k | £17.45k | £1.05k | £894 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 January 2025 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
BLACKHALL AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Royal Air Forces Association
Middle Street
Blackhall Colliery
HARTLEPOOL
TS27 4EA
- Phone:
- 07957 939080
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window