ENDON WELL DRESSING FESTIVAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees maintain and repair the village well. In accordance with the terms of their appointment the trustees permit an annual Well Dressing Festival to take place. Surplus money goes to the work on the well and also to support local young people's organisations like the sunday schools, the girl guides, the brownies, the scouts and the cubs and others
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 10 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Sillitoe | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Sambrook | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE WEBB | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN STRETCH | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DOLAN | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE BAGGULEY | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY JOHN WEAVER | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH FOSTER SHACKLETON | Trustee | 24 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BARLOW | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK ANDREW SIMCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN R WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN A PICKFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £2.22k | £779 | £14.65k | £3.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39k | £2.75k | £5.07k | £12.73k | £5.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 November 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 DECEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
INCOME OF THE CHARITY TO BE APPLIED IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- 1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESPECTIVE SUNDAY SCHOOLS CONNECTED WITH THE PARISH CHURCH AND THE METHODIST CHAPEL AT ENDON. 2) FOR THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES IN ENDON NOT PROVIED OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS BYWAY OF PAYMENT TO MANAGERS OR GOVERNORS OF VOLUNTARY OR MAINTAINED SCHOOLS AT ENDON AND IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INDLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN ENDON. 3) FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS HEREINAFTER CONTAINED. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 24 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
ENDON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moss House
Park Lane
Endon
Stoke-on-Trent
ST9 9JD
- Phone:
- 01782503313
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window