YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION NEATH BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 1875, YMCA Neath is a non profit making charitable association serving the people of the Neath North Ward and surrounding areas. A community based organisation providing a wide range of educational, sporting and recreational activities for children, young people and adults in our local and neighbouring communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,200 from 5 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 25 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN LEWIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emrys Elias | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Marcia Hughes | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Lynn Maddocks | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hemington | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Delyth Morwen Lewis | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Richard Lockyer | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MARTIN EVANS | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Clive Ball | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Bryn John | Trustee | 02 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Alun James | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Joanna L Jenkins MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.64k | £106.65k | £93.14k | £117.45k | £156.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.61k | £92.45k | £91.99k | £140.36k | £133.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.85k | N/A | £10.38k | £42.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION YMCA
Charitable objects
FIRST, TO LEAD YOUNG MEN AND BOYS TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULNESS OF LIFE IN HIM AND, SECONDLY, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG MEN AND BOYS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NEATH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEATH YMCA
LLETTY NEDD
PENYDRE
NEATH
SA11 3HG
- Phone:
- 01639 769315
- Email:
- info@neathymca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window