POLICE DEPENDANTS' TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity have transferred to the Police Dependants' Trust Limited, registered charity number 1151322 Promoting the efficiency of the Police service in the UK by the relief of: (a) beneficiaries in cases of need/hardship/distress; (b) mental/physical sickness/disability/infirmity among among beneficiaries;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 January 1967: Standard registration
- 01 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39m | £1.08m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03m | £1.35m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £483.05k | £424.64k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £901.90k | £646.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £6.00k | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £197.23k | £132.51k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.76m | £1.07m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £162.26k | £75.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £24.64k | £115.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 March 2016 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 26 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 DECEMBER 1966 AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 8 JUNE 1971, 13 MAY 1981 AND 21 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND A RESOLUTION OF 22 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE FORCE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY: (A) THE RELIEF OF BENEFICIARIES IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (B) THE RELIEF OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR INFIRMITY AMONG BENEFICIARIES; (C) THE RELIEF OF OLD AGE AMONG BENEFICIARIES; (D) THE PROVISION OR SUPPORT OF FACILITIES FOR SPORTS AND RECREATION AND OTHER FORMS OF LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (E) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ASSISTING BENEFICIARIES IN CASES OF NEED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window