ALEXANDERS DISCOUNT COMPANY LIMITED CLERKS WIDOWS AND CHILDRENS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Help the Elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Credit Agricole CIB Trustees Ltd | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £1.02k | £1.05k | £1.08k | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.93k | £1.02k | £1.02k | £1.08k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 February 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 7TH MARCH 1893. HIGH COURT ORDER DATED 5TH MAY 1964.
Charitable objects
INCOME OF THE FUNDS FOR THE BENEFIT OF (I) ANY POOR PERSON OR PERSONS FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN THE OFFICES OF ALEXANDERS DISCOUNT COMPANY LIMITED (FOMERLY ALEXANDER & COMPANY LIMITED) OTHER THA DIRECTORS OF THE SAID COMPANY WHO SHALL HAVE LEFT SUCH COMPANY'S EMPLOYMENT OWING TO MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY AND (II) ANY POOR WIDOWS OR POOR CHILDREN OF ANY PERSONS FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN THE OFFICES OF THE SAID COMPANY (OTHER THAN DIRECTORS OF THE SAID COMPANY) WHO SHALL HAVE DIED WHILE IN SUCH EMPLOYMENT OR WHILE IN RECEIPT OF A PENSION OR RETIRING ALLOWANCE IN RESPECT OF SUCH EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Credit Agricole C I B Trustees Ltd
Broadwalk House
5 Appold Street
LONDON
EC2A 2DA
- Phone:
- 02072147110
- Email:
- Adrian.Tubbs@ca-cib.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window