KONSTAM CENTRE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children Centre Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 17 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The council of the London Borough of CAmden | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 6TH SEPTEMBER 1966.
Charitable objects
PROPERTY TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSE OF A CENTRE FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AND WELFARE OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
HIGHGATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Crowndale Centre
220 Eversholt Street
London
NW1 1BD
- Phone:
- 02079741525
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window