Governing document THE INSTITUTE OF ROAD TRANSPORT ENGINEERS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 1970, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16/10/86, 3/11/88, 2/11/89, 14/11/91, 19/11/92, 9TH NOVEMBER 1995, 16TH MAY 1996, 12TH NOVEMBER 1998 AND 17TH NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
(A) TO IMPROVE AND ELEVATE THE TECHNICAL AND GENERAL SKILL, KNOWLEDGE AND COMPETENCE AND PROMOTE THE SCIENTIFIC TRAINING OF PERSONS ENGAGED IN OR DESIRING OR INTENDING TO ENGAGE IN THE CALLING (IE ROAD TRANSPORT ENGINEER) OR IN ANY EMPLOYMENT MANUAL OR OTHERWISE, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH. (B) TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF SAFETY OF VEHICLES AND ROADS OF ALL KINDS (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 15TH OCTOBER 1970).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.