Friends of Caterham Dene Hospital

Charity number: 251089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The object of the charity is to provide a link between the hospital and the local community and provide better amenities for patients at the hospital and in the community, including better equipment and facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £31,086
Total expenditure: £51,360

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 January 1967: Standard registration
  • 24 February 2016: Funds received from 206390 AGE CONCERN (CATERHAM AND DISTRICT AREA)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF CATERHAM DENE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERENICE CARMAN FRITH Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Hetty Duck Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Geraint Jenkins Trustee 18 May 2023
CATERHAM OVERSEAS AID TRUST
Received: On time
COMMUNITY HEALTH AND EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN OF KIMILILI
Received: On time
Jane Hampson Trustee 18 May 2023
None on record
Linda Woodland Trustee 07 June 2021
None on record
John Hazell Trustee 10 October 2018
None on record
Stephen Peter Slade Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
JEAN MALLERY Trustee 10 May 2016
None on record
ROSEMARY BAILEY Trustee 23 October 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £69.36k £18.08k £16.59k £22.48k £31.09k
Total expenditure £10.94k £29.69k £75.06k £15.35k £51.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 10 April 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 28 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCH ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 5RA
Phone:
07484726708
Website:

No information available