THE LAUFFER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The application of the trust fund and income thereof for general charitable purposes as specified in the trust deed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 1967: Standard registration
- THE R AND D LAUFFER CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN SIMON LAUFFER | Chair | 14 December 1994 |
|
|||||
ROBIN MICHAEL LAUFFER | Trustee | 22 January 1997 |
|
|
||||
GIDEON LOUIS LAUFFER | Trustee | 14 December 1994 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.51k | £118.41k | £121.28k | £129.61k | £127.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £503.04k | £427.70k | £548.36k | £577.34k | £504.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 DECEMBER 1965
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT GENERAL SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, CANADA, AUSTRALIA, NEW ZEALAND, THE UNION OF SOUTH AFRICA, PAKISTAN ,CEYLON ,REPUBLIC OF INDIA, ANY OTHER TERRITORIES FORMING PART OF THE BRITISH COMMONWEALTH, THE STATE OF ISRAEL AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 HAMPSTEAD WAY
LONDON
NW11 7JN
- Phone:
- 02076373210
- Email:
- jonathanlauffer13@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window