STRATFORD-UPON-AVON SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a local civic society we organise educational activities to encourage awareness of local heritage. We hold seminars to share best practice with similar towns and we make recommendations to the local councils on the physical and economic development of the town. We publish educational books on the local environment and we support local schools in their citizenship curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £5,480 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 22 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jann Tracy | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Stevenson | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven John Turner | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Cund | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Devereux | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Bearman | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Lindsay Macdonald | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Brittan Prosser | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Scampion | Trustee | 18 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEVIN PATRICK BOND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £2.45k | £4.05k | £16.43k | £10.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.71k | £1.02k | £2.51k | £12.05k | £7.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £5.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/01/1966 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2001 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2015
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS; B) TO STIMULATE AN INTEREST AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE SAID AREA; C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE SAID AREA.
Area of benefit
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON AND SURROUNDINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Farnell Drive
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Warwickshire
CV37 9DJ
- Phone:
- 01789293110
- Email:
- info@stratfordsociety.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window