Linked charities THE PLYMOUTH CITY MISSION

Charity number: 251197
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MAY 1929, SCHEME OF 3 JUNE 1935 AND SCHEME OF 13 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE WORK OF THE PLYMOUTH CITY MISSION AND FOR THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE STRUCTURE AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE MISSION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 February 1967 : Standard registration
  • 03 May 2000 : Removed
  • 03 May 2000 : Asset transfer out