ST MARY'S SPORTS GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES TENNIS FACILITIES, MEETING SPACE AND OPEN SPACE FOR SPORTS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF THOSE RESIDING IN, OR CLOSE TO, THE PARISH OF ST.MARY'S, SPRING GROVE, ISLEWORTH, MIDDLESEX AT THE GROUND IN MUSGRAVE ROAD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hounslow
Governance
- 27 February 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GREEN | Chair | 31 March 1996 |
|
|
||||
Gilly Bevan | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
KIERON MAY | Trustee | 31 March 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.33k | £21.57k | £33.45k | £10.43k | £12.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.70k | £9.57k | £9.82k | £9.64k | £19.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £19.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 MAR 1929 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20 DEC 1966
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH OF ST. MARY SPRING GROVE IN THE COUNTY OF GREATER LONDON.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY SPRING GROVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 EVERSLEY CRESCENT
ISLEWORTH
TW7 4LR
- Phone:
- 02085608488
- Email:
- trusteessmsg@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window