(TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH) PARK AVENUE BAPTIST CHURCH, REDCAR
Charity Number: 251260
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving God's Purpose in Redcar and Cleveland through Worship, Discipleship, Building Community and Mission
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income: £32,384
Total expenditure: £19,906
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
Registration history:
- 14 June 1967: Standard registration
- 16 November 2022: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 16 November 2022: Funds transferred to 1186196 Redcar Baptist Church
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.80k | £140.38k | £99.86k | £68.33k | £32.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.55k | £105.95k | £102.11k | £62.85k | £19.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £1.55k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 31 May 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27TH JANUARY 1948.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE PARK AVENUE BAPTIST CHURCH, REDCAR.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
REDCAR
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window