THE CHURCHILL COLLEGE CHAPEL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity Number: 251277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of Christian religious services

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £18,205
Total expenditure: £14,379

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr MARTYN ALAN JOHNSON Chair
None on record
Dr Ewan Campbell Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Dr Jonathan Padley Trustee 16 May 2018
CHURCHILL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
Dr E DeMarrais Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER TOUT Trustee 04 April 2013
None on record
DR C O'KANE Trustee 08 October 2012
None on record
Dr JAMES RITCHIE NORRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £162.11k £13.25k £15.13k £40.13k £18.20k
Total expenditure £150.01k £7.82k £42.01k £32.04k £14.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHURCHILL COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0DS
Phone:
01223336201