Accounts and annual returns THE BROOK HOSPITAL POST GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE FUND

Charity Number: 251293
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 26 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 22 July 2008 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2004 26 May 2005 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required