MARKET WEIGHTON WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For Social and Recreational Intercourse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 31 January 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Mackinder | Chair | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Chicken | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|||||
David Naylor | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Pridmore | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Bradley | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Atkinson | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Morag McLaren | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Burton | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Johnson | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kneeshaw | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Atkinson | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cooper | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rodmell | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Craig Cayton | Trustee | 28 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.35k | £70.51k | £132.29k | £146.59k | £154.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.08k | £61.54k | £129.92k | £158.35k | £163.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.88k | £32.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1924, TRUST DEED DATED 17TH APRIL 1925 (U.V. 222P.131A) AND SCHEME OF 1ST DECEMBER 1965 AND SCHEME OF 9 JULY 1973
Charitable objects
TO BE USED AS A NON-SECTARIAN AND NON-POLITICAL PLACE OF RECREATION AND SOCIAL INTERCOURSE UNDER THE NAME OF THE MARKET WEIGHTON WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE FOR THE ADVANTAGE OR BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MARKET WEIGHTON AND ARRAS EITHER GRATITIOUSLY OR IN CONSIDERATION OF ANY MONEY PAYMENT OR ON TERMS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
MARKET WEIGHTON AND ARRAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
5 SPRING ROAD
MARKET WEIGHTON
YORK
YO43 3JJ
- Phone:
- 01430873484
- Email:
- craigcayton@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window