THE COLLIER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 251333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making gifts to charitable organisations known by the trustees to be engaged in work in accordance with the purposes of the trust and to be in need of such support.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £19,025
Total expenditure: £51,274

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1967: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JONATHAN CHARLES MORLEY TIPPETT Chair 12 November 2015
ST CATHERINE'S SCHOOL BRAMLEY
Received: On time
Lucy Jane Pash Trustee 27 November 2024
None on record
JEFFERY CHARLES SEABROOK Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, WEST WICKHAM
Received: On time
CONEY HALL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £25.16k £20.01k £19.11k £20.92k £19.02k
Total expenditure £58.85k £93.28k £52.71k £87.71k £51.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
80 Kingswood Firs
Grayshott
Hindhead
GU26 6EX
Phone:
01428 604695
Website:

No information available