THE OLD COMRADES ASSOCIATION OF THE ARMY COMMANDOS (1940-1946)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 21 March 1967: Standard registration
- 23 May 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 23 May 2006: Funds transferred to 229631 THE COMMANDOS BENEVOLENT FUND
- COMMANDO ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- THE COMMANDO ASSOCIATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.46k | £23.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.09k | £26.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 01 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 01 December 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 16 February 2005 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS VARIED BY A SCHEME OF 30 JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE BY CHARITABLE MEANS OF THOSE WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMY COMMANDOS, THEIR WIVES AND DEPENDANTS AND THE WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS OF THOSE ARMY COMMANDOS WHO DIED WHILE SERVING OR THEREAFTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window