FRIENDS OF BOLTON MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To act as a support organisation for Bolton Museum, Art Gallery and Aquarium, raising funds for the purchase of artefacts and also to financially assist in improvements to the galleries/aquarium.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolton
Governance
- 16 February 1967: Standard registration
- 19 November 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 19 November 2018: Funds transferred to 1038507 FRIENDS OF SMITHILLS HALL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.76k | £18.00k | £14.52k | £9.93k | £8.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.82k | £16.42k | £19.54k | £10.15k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 03 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 03 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES JANUARY 20 1967
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE APPRECIATION OF THE FINE ARTS AND MUSEUM ACTIVITIES WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BOLTON CORPORATION MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY AND TO PROVIDE MONEY FOR THE PURCHASE BY THE TRUSTEES OF THE SOCIETY OF MUSEUM OBJECTS AND PICTURES, SCULPTURES AND OTHER WORKS OF ART, AND FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MUSEUM ACTIVITIES AND OF THE FINE ARTS AS MAY BY LAW DE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
BOLTON METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window