Financial history THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL MADRID SANTA LUISA PROVINCE

Charity number: 251388
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/04/2008 03/04/2009 03/04/2010 03/04/2011 03/04/2012
Total gross income £129.41k £143.76k £138.72k £154.83k £155.77k
Total expenditure £135.91k £143.40k £138.67k £153.91k £122.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A