CONWAY HALL ETHICAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study and dissemination of ethical principles; the cultivation of a rational and humane way of life; and the advancement of research and education in relevant fields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 May 1967: Standard registration
- 19 June 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 19 June 2017: Funds transferred to 1156033 CONWAY HALL ETHICAL SOCIETY
- SOUTH PLACE ETHICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- SPES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £549.94k | £600.75k | £667.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £597.71k | £614.21k | £742.20k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.76k | £3.78k | £60.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £514.98k | £543.72k | £569.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £509 | £27.96k | £30.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £23.70k | £25.29k | £7.13k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £6.39k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £206.88k | £185.45k | £255.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.73k | £18.52k | £32.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £378.10k | £410.24k | £453.78k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 24 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 14 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 11 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 11 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 24 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 24 December 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 30/11/1938 AS AMENDED ON 25/01/1939 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/1947 AS AMENDED ON 21/12/1947 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/1949 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/1949 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/1883 AS AMENDED ON 05/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND DISSEMINATION OF ETHICAL PRINCIPLES AND THE CULTIVATION OF A RATIONAL RELIGIOUS SENTIMENT.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window