Financial history ROYAL LEAMINGTON SPA HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 251398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.72k £812 £3.23k £2.45k £4.64k
Total expenditure £4.70k £335 £4.51k £3.05k £5.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A