Financial history RSPCA EAST BERKSHIRE BRANCH

Charity number: 251481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £40.34k £67.13k £41.00k £69.68k £50.45k
Total expenditure £36.83k £34.38k £44.42k £59.77k £82.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A