Financial history PROCEEDS OF SALE OF SKIPTON TEMPERANCE HALL

Charity Number: 251537
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/04/2020 04/04/2021 04/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.71k £198.20k £21.34k £10.80k £24.11k
Total expenditure £11.81k £12.90k £12.72k £61.96k £17.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A