Financial history FULHAM AND SOUTH KENSINGTON BRANCH OF THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 251555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £147.71k £248.97k £167.52k £168.52k £184.24k
Total expenditure £41.97k £99.07k £105.84k £146.01k £197.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A