FULHAM AND SOUTH KENSINGTON BRANCH OF THE YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fulham and South Kensington YMCA makes funds or facilities available to Christian organisations and individuals who are either in particular hardship or undertaking significant work within their community or in training for such work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
- Staffordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- FULHAM & SOUTH KENSINGTON YMCA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Calvert Martin Anderson McCauley | Chair | 19 May 1990 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Andrew O'Brien | Trustee | 20 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joel Andrew Shepherd | Trustee | 17 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Beck McDowell | Trustee | 17 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL WILLIAM LAFFEY | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEFFERY JOEL SHEPHERD | Trustee | 26 October 2011 |
|
|||||
Martin Joseph Hartigan | Trustee | 16 May 2009 |
|
|
||||
IVOR ANDREW SOWTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DEVEREUX MALTBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.73k | £147.71k | £248.97k | £167.52k | £168.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.52k | £41.97k | £99.07k | £105.84k | £146.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED ON 25/05/1967 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/2000 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2015 as amended on 18 May 2019 as amended on 20 May 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM; 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITION OF THEIR LIFE. 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES. 4. TO RELIEVE PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. 5. TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 13 June 1967 : Standard registration
- 28 June 2010 : Removed
- 28 June 2010 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 HAMBLE ROAD
BEDFORD
MK41 7XW
- Phone:
- 01234357854
- Email:
- andrewmaltby@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window