HALL GREEN LITTLE THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"...to encourage and promote the presentation and performance of dramatic productions of cultural and/or educational value and to advance the standard of production and performance in regard thereto....to promote an understanding of theatre within the community; ...to encourage members to bring their individual skills to teach and learn, and young people to develop through the Youth Theatre..."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 21 March 1967: Standard registration
- HALL GREEN LITTLE THEATRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Frank Richardson | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edwin Holtom | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Woodward | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marie Price | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Scott | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bretton Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Anne Davies | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.68k | £7.11k | £46.09k | £72.18k | £100.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.54k | £26.68k | £43.54k | £56.49k | £54.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 July 2023 | 416 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 13 June 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 13 June 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29 JULY 1960, AS AMENDED 5TH MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF DRAMA BY THE PROMOTION OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF SUCH ART AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION THEREIN. (FOR FUTHER DETAILS SEE ABOVE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORTED ON THE 29 JULY 1960).
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
HALL GREEN LITTLE THEATRE LTD
PEMBERLEY ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B27 7RY
- Phone:
- 01217772121
- Email:
- info@hglt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window