Trustees HALL GREEN LITTLE THEATRE LIMITED
Charity Number: 251575

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Frank Richardson | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edwin Holtom | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Woodward | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marie Price | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard James Scott | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bretton Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Anne Davies | Trustee | 04 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.