THE BORROWELL CLERGY HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for retired Anglican clergy and partners
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 February 1967: Standard registration
- THE BORROWELL CLERGY HOME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER JEAN ALFORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MARK LOVEGROVE | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Kathleen Henry | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID EDWARD PETTIFOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RIGHT REVD DR CHRISTOPHER COCKSWORTH BISHOP OF COVENTRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.39k | £53.16k | £54.18k | £58.05k | £52.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.49k | £32.34k | £30.61k | £68.68k | £40.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF ELLEN MADELINE MARGETTS PROVED AT BIRMINGHAM 30TH OCTOBER 1940 DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST JULY 1941 AND SCHEME OF THE 9TH JANUARY 1962. AS ALTERED OR AFFECTED BY THE COMMISSIONERS SCHEME OF 4TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
1. MAINTENANCE OF HOMES FOR: (A) THE PERMANENT RESIDENCE AND RETIREMENT OF MEN AND WOMEN OF THE CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, WITH THEIR SPOUSES AND DEPENDENT CHILDREN, WHO SHALL BE IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES AND SHALL BY REASON OF AGE, SICKNESS OR BODILY INFIRMITY BE WHOLLY OR PARTLY INCAPACITATED FROM HOLDING OR CONTINUING TO HOLD ANY PREFERMENT; (B) THE TEMPORARY REST RELIEF OR RECUPERATION OF SICK OR INFIRM MEN OR WOMEN OF THE CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES. 2. (A) THE TEMPORARY REST, RELIEF OR RECUPERATION OF MEN OR WOMEN OF REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES, AND (B) THE PERMANENT RESIDENCE AND RETIREMENT OF SUCH MEN OR WOMEN AS IMMEDIATELY BEFORE MENTIONED IN PARAGRAPH (A) WITH PREFERENCE FOR SUCH MEN OR WOMEN WHO ARE THE WIDOWS OR WIDOWERS OF DECEASED CLERGYMEN OR WOMEN FORMERLY RESIDENT IN THE HOMES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Dencer Drive
KENILWORTH
Warwickshire
CV8 2RU
- Phone:
- 01926852085
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window