THE MUNRO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support relief of deprivation or disability by registered charities in LB of Merton and Hounslow, W Sussex in area between Worthing, Chichester and Horsham, and North Hampshire. Typical grant £1000 if making significant contribution to recipient finances. Applicants must have appropriate policies. Individuals are not directly supported. We leave 2 years between grants. Trustees meet twice yearly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
- Hounslow
- Merton
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 April 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Katon | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
James Munro | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIR ALAN GORDON MUNRO KCMG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL GORDON MUNRO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.52k | £17.43k | £13.25k | £17.27k | £12.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.86k | £17.90k | £12.91k | £11.96k | £13.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1966
Charitable objects
TO BE APPLIED TO SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 CRANBROOK ROAD
LONDON
W4 2LJ
- Phone:
- 02089958152
- Email:
- trustmunro@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window