ROTARY CLUB OF STOKE-ON-TRENT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising Collections
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 21 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR GEOFFREY HILLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN EDWARD ANTHONY MARSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CALDWELL STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.92k | £2.76k | £1.04k | £55 | £414 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £2.70k | £1.50k | £250 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND PAYMENT TO ANY FUND OR ORGANISATION WHICH IS A REGISTERED CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - NORMALLY LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
TARA SPRINGS
2 Grange Court
Biddulph
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST8 6RX
- Phone:
- 01782514393
- Email:
- secretary@rotary.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window