CITY OF SALFORD RELIEF OF DISTRESS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Benefit either of the poor of the City of Salford as constituted on 1 April 1974 generally or of such poor persons resident therein as they select
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Salford City
Governance
- 16 March 1967: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Jack Youd | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Tanya Burch | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr John Merry | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Gina Reynolds | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176 | £37 | £20 | £360 | £914 | |
|
Total expenditure | £760 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 13 SEPTEMBER 1966 AND 14 OCTOBER 1977
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE POOR OF THE CITY OF SALFORD AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 1 APRIL 1974 GENERALLY OR OF SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THEY SELECT. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 12 AND 13 OF SCHEME OF THE 13 SEPTEMBER 1966.)
Area of benefit
CITY OF SALFORD AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 1 APRIL 1974
Contact information
- Address:
-
Salford City Council
2nd Floor
Phase 2 Civic Centre
Chorley Road
Swinton
M27 5DA
- Phone:
- 01617932570
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window