BEVERLEY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations and Gifts to clients of the Westwood Community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 March 1967: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- WESTWOOD HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY FRIENDS (Working name)
- EAST YORKSHIRE COMMUNITY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- THE EAST YORKSHIRE MENTAL HEALTH LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BROADGATE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- WESTWOOD HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY FRIENDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.83k | £280 | £422 | £562 | |
|
Total expenditure | £857 | £2.63k | £354 | £410 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 August 2010 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 March 2009 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JANUARY 1962 AS AMENDED 10TH APRIL 1990 AND 25TH JULY 1995 AND 5TH SEPTEMBER 1995 AND 28TH JUNE 2000 AND 27 APRIL 2005 AND 2 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE WESTWOOD HOSPITAL AND OTHER PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (INCLUDING THE MENTALLY ILL). THIS WILL BE DONE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE RELEVANT PROFESSIONALS INVOLVED IN THE INDIVIDUAL'S CARE. 2. TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND IN THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window