Accounts and annual returns FREDERICK COOLING TOWNSEND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 251738
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2009 30 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 19 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2007 22 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 18 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 07 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required