THE KING'S COLLEGE HOSPITAL NURSES' LEAGUE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides assistance to King's College Hospital Nurses and Midwives wherever they may be in the world, and whether members of the King's College Hospital Nurses League or not.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 July 1970: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER MARGARET COLEMAN | Chair | 11 July 2011 |
|
|||||
JANE KATHERINE JARVIS | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MARY FLETCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.52k | £43.17k | £6.17k | £14.79k | £9.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.90k | £10.28k | £24.59k | £22.56k | £33.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH AUGUST 1938 AS SUPPLEMENTED 12TH JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NECESSITOUS CASES AND ASSISTANCE TO NURSES OF KING,S COLLEGE HOSPITAL WHETHER MEMBERS OF THE LEAGUE OR NOT TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE ADDITIONAL POST GRADUATE TRAINING AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE BENEVOLENT FUND. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2(B) OF THE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
389 TOPSHAM ROAD
EXETER
EX2 6HB
- Phone:
- 01392876415
- Email:
- jkjarvis05@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window