THE TEULU JAMES PANTYFEDWEN STRATA FLORIDA CHURCHYARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Responsibility for Strata Florida Churchyard - a community churchyard - including burials, maintenance, day to day running and management thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 10 May 1967: Standard registration
- PANTYFEDWEN CHURCHYARD TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR GARETH EDWARDS | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
REVERAND NICHOLAS BEE | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR ELGAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aled Wyn Lewis | Trustee | 13 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane l Evans | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Watkin | Trustee | 03 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR IFAN DAVIES | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LEWIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARY ELEANOR MYFANWY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.99k | £12.03k | £10.17k | £13.26k | £15.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.71k | £12.70k | £11.13k | £15.18k | £13.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 October 2021 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MARCH 1966 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 9 MARCH 1982.
Charitable objects
1. THE MANAGEMENT, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, IMPROVEMENT AND UPKEEP OF THE BURIAL GROUND OR CHURCHYARD SURROUNDING ST.MARY`S CHURCH STRATA FLORIDA AND ANY EXTENSION THEREOF AND ALL OTHER LAND CONNECTED THERETO. 2. ú50 PER ANNUM TO BE PAID TO AUGMENT THE STIPEND OF THE INCUMBENT OF STRATA FLORIDA. 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CALCULATED TO FACILITATE THE PROPER MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE BURIAL GROUND AND ANY EXTENSION THERETO. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 5 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CERIDFAN
PONTRHYDFENDIGAID
YSTRAD MEURIG
SY25 6BB
- Phone:
- 01974831476
- Email:
- enidelenydd@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window