COUNCIL OF VOLUNTARY WELFARE WORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CVWW works under the auspices of a Ministry of Defence Charter in coordinating the work of Christian member organisations which support the Armed Services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of Westminster
- Cyprus
- Falkland Islands
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 April 1967: Standard registration
- CVWW (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Woodhouse | Chair | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Joseph Patrick Petty | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Scott James Sinclair Shackleton | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAKIN | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Lt Col , Dr Martin Gliniecki QGM, CEng | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Gosnell | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Major Colin Stevens | Trustee | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.60k | £34.15k | £34.15k | £34.15k | £35.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.21k | £32.29k | £32.72k | £31.01k | £26.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.50k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH FEBRUARY 1967 AS AMENDED 5TH MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
ADVANCE THE CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED ON BY MEMBER ORGANISATIONS AMONG THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROOM 2-20
WELLINGTON BARRACKS
BIRDCAGE WALK
LONDON
SW1E 6HQ
- Phone:
- 020 3903 6027
- Email:
- gensec@cvww.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window