Governing document THE ROYAL ANGLIAN REGIMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 251850
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED ON 1ST DECEMBER 1971. 28TH JULY 1972 AND 21ST OCTOBER 1976 SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 10TH JULY 1997, CONST. AS AMENDED 17 MAY 2002.
Charitable objects
REFERRING FOR CONSIDERATION BY THE BENEVOLENCE COMMITTEE OF THE REGIONAL BENEVOLENT CHARITY, IN TIMES OF NEED, THOSE PAST AND PRESENT MEMBERS OF THE REGIMENT, THE FORMER REGIMENTS OR THOSE DEPENDANTS, WIDOWS OR ORPHANS OF THOSE WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.